Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/25/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 10/01/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/08/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/17/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/05/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/17/2003