Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 09/17/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/23/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/30/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/01/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/07/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/07/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/07/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/08/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/15/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/15/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/15/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/17/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/28/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/29/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/29/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/30/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/30/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/30/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/04/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/05/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/06/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 11/06/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/07/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/12/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/14/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/17/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/17/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/18/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/18/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/19/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 11/19/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/25/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/08/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/10/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/10/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/10/2004
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/10/2004
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/09/2004