Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 09/23/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/16/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/16/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/16/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/16/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 10/16/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/16/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/16/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/16/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/16/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/16/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 10/16/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/16/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 10/16/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/16/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 10/16/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/16/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/16/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/16/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/16/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/16/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/16/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/16/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/16/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/16/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/16/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/16/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/16/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/16/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/16/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/16/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/16/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/16/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/16/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/16/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/16/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/16/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 10/16/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/16/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 10/21/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/21/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 10/21/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/21/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/21/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/21/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 10/28/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 10/28/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/28/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/28/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/28/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/30/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/30/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/30/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/30/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/30/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 11/04/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/07/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 11/07/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/07/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/07/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/07/2003
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 11/07/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/07/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 11/20/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/20/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/20/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/20/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/21/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/21/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/28/2004
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/28/2004
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 01/28/2004
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 01/28/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/28/2004
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/26/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/10/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/10/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 03/10/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/10/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/02/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/02/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/02/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/02/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/02/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/02/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/02/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/27/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/27/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/12/2004
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/17/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/17/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/17/2004
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/17/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/17/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/17/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/14/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/14/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/22/2004
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/07/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/07/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/09/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/09/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/21/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/23/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/06/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/08/2004