There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Benjamin Franklin True Patriot Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for an appropriate review of recently enacted legislation relating to terrorism to assure that powers granted in it do not inappropriately undermine civil liberties.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/24/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date
10/22/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/14/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Education Reform.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
10/14/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
10/09/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and the Census.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
09/25/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/24/2003Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
Action By: House of Representatives
09/24/2003Referred to House Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
09/24/2003Referred to House Education and the Workforce
Action By: House of Representatives
09/24/2003Referred to House Intelligence (Permanent)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/24/2003Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
09/24/2003Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), Education and the Workforce, Government Reform, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/24/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/24/2003 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims10/22/2003 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)09/24/2003 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce09/24/2003 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness10/14/2003 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Education Reform10/14/2003 Referred to
House Government Reform09/24/2003 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and the Census10/09/2003 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/24/2003 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation09/25/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3171.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3171. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/24/2003)

Benjamin Franklin True Patriot Act - Provides that each provision of law, regulation, or other policy directive listed in this Act and any amendments made by that provision, shall cease to have effect 90 days after the date of the enactment of this Act.

Authorizes Congress, during such period and at the request of the President, to hold hearings to determine whether a particular section should be removed from the list with respect to the USA PATRIOT Act.

Applies this Act to specified provisions in: (1) the USA PATRIOT Act; (2) the Aviation Security Act excluding permanent resident aliens from being baggage checkers; (3) the Homeland Security Act 2002; (4) certain immigration regulations; (5) the Federal Register relating to monitoring conversations between attorneys and clients; (6) the memorandum of Attorney General Ashcroft dated October 12, 2001, and relating to the disclosure of documents under the Freedom of Information Act; and (7) any regulations having the effect of changing the effect of Attorney General Dick Thornburg's Guidelines on General Crimes, Racketeering Enterprise and Domestic Security/Terrorism Investigations (particularly with respect to religious institution spying), approved March 21, 1989.