Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 09/25/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/25/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/25/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/25/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/02/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/02/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/02/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/02/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/02/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/07/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/07/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/07/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/21/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/21/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/21/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/21/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 10/21/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/21/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/28/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 10/28/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/28/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/28/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/28/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/30/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/30/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/30/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/30/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/30/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/30/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/30/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/30/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/05/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/05/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/05/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/05/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/05/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/05/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/07/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/07/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/07/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/07/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/07/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/07/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/07/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/17/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/17/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/17/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 11/17/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/21/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/21/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 12/08/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 12/08/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/08/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/20/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/20/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/20/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 01/28/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 01/28/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 01/28/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/28/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/28/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 01/28/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/28/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/03/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/03/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/03/2004
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/03/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/26/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/26/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/26/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/26/2004
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/26/2004
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/17/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/17/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/17/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/23/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/25/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/25/2004
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/05/2004
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/12/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/12/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/12/2004
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/17/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/02/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/13/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/15/2004
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/15/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/22/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/22/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/08/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/17/2004