Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 01/08/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 01/27/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/27/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/28/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 01/28/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 02/05/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/05/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/04/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/03/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/04/2003