Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 09/25/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/25/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 09/25/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/07/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/29/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/07/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/27/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 02/03/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/11/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/11/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/26/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/05/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/03/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/21/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/24/2004
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/07/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/19/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/08/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/08/2004