Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/01/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/08/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/16/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/17/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/20/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 10/21/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/28/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/28/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/28/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/29/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/29/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/29/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/29/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/30/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/30/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/30/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 11/06/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/19/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/20/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/20/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 11/20/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/21/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 11/21/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/20/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/20/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 01/20/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/20/2004
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/20/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/20/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/21/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/23/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/10/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/17/2004
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 06/08/2004