Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/02/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/02/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/02/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/02/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/02/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/02/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/02/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/08/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/08/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/08/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/08/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/08/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/08/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/08/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 10/16/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/16/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/16/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/16/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/21/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/21/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/21/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/21/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 11/06/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/06/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/06/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 11/06/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/06/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/18/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 11/18/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/18/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/18/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/18/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/18/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/18/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 11/20/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 11/20/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 11/20/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 01/27/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/27/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/04/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/02/2004
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/27/2004