Refine your search

Refined by:

Arizona Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 10/08/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/01/2004
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/28/2004
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/22/2004
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 09/07/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew