Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/02/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/02/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 10/02/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/02/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/02/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/21/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 11/21/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/10/2004
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/11/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/11/2004
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/28/2004
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/06/2004
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/14/2004
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/17/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/17/2004
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 06/21/2004
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/22/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew