Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/02/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/02/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/02/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/07/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 01/21/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/10/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/28/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/20/2004
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/09/2004
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/17/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/21/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/22/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/06/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew