Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 10/02/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/08/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/21/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 10/21/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 11/21/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/17/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew