Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/08/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/21/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/21/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/21/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/09/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/28/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew