Refine your search

Refined by:

Kentucky Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/08/2003
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/06/2004
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/09/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/16/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew