Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/02/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/02/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/02/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/28/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/28/2004
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/28/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/09/2004
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/15/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew