Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/30/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/07/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/03/2004
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/17/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/17/2004
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/18/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/21/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/09/2004
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/21/2004
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/22/2004
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 07/22/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew