Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/08/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/21/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 10/30/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 10/30/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/10/2004
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/28/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/20/2004
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 06/14/2004
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/17/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew