Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 10/08/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/08/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/30/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/30/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/07/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/01/2004
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/16/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/17/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew