Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 09/25/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/08/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/08/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/29/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/30/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/17/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/17/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/17/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/17/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/17/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/20/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/20/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/20/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/25/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/25/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/25/2004
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/04/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/17/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/17/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/17/2004
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/23/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/23/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 03/23/2004
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/24/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 04/22/2004
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/22/2004
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/22/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/22/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 04/28/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/28/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/05/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/05/2004
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/05/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/13/2004
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/17/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/17/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/17/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/17/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/20/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/24/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/08/2004
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/14/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/14/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/20/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/08/2004
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/22/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/22/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/22/2004
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/22/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/23/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/08/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/19/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/06/2004