Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 09/30/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 09/30/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/30/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/30/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 09/30/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/30/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 09/30/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 09/30/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 09/30/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 09/30/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 09/30/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 09/30/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/30/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 09/30/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 10/01/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/01/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/01/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/01/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 10/01/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/01/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/01/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 10/01/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/01/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 10/01/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/01/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/02/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/07/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/07/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/07/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/14/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/14/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 10/14/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/14/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/14/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/17/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 10/17/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/21/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/21/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/24/2003