Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 10/01/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 10/01/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/01/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/02/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/02/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/08/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 10/21/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/21/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/21/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/21/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/30/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/30/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/30/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/07/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/07/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 11/07/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/20/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/20/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/11/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/11/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/11/2004
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 02/11/2004
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/11/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/11/2004
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 02/26/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/26/2004
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/26/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/26/2004
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/04/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/04/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/04/2004
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/04/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 03/11/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/11/2004
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/11/2004
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/11/2004
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/18/2004
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 03/18/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/18/2004
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/18/2004
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 03/18/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/18/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/18/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/18/2004
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/18/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/18/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/18/2004
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/18/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/18/2004
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/18/2004
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/18/2004
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/18/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/18/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/02/2004
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 04/02/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/02/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/02/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/02/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/01/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/01/2004
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 07/07/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/07/2004