Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/02/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/03/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/03/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/07/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/07/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/07/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/08/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/08/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/08/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/15/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/15/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/15/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/15/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/15/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/15/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/16/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/17/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/17/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/28/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/28/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/28/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/29/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/20/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/08/2003