Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/27/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/27/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/27/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/27/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 01/27/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/27/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/27/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/27/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/27/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 01/27/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/27/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/27/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 01/27/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/27/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/27/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/27/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/28/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/28/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/28/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 01/28/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/04/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/04/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/04/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/12/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/12/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/12/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/27/2003