Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 10/02/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 10/02/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/02/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/07/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/07/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/07/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/15/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/15/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/15/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/15/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/15/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/15/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/15/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/15/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/15/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/15/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/15/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/17/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/17/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/21/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/29/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/29/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/29/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/29/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/29/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/29/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/29/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/29/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/04/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/08/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/01/2004