Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 10/02/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 10/02/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/08/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/08/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/08/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 10/17/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/17/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/17/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/17/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/21/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/21/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/29/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/29/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 10/29/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 10/29/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/29/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/29/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/29/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/29/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/05/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/05/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/05/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 11/05/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/07/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/17/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/17/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 11/18/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 11/19/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/19/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/21/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/21/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/03/2004
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/03/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/25/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/25/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/25/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/17/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/17/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/24/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/24/2004
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/01/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/01/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/01/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/21/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/21/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/21/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 04/22/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/06/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/06/2004
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/06/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/06/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/06/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/06/2004
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 05/06/2004
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/13/2004
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/13/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/13/2004
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/13/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/13/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/13/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/01/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/01/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/17/2004
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/09/2004
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/09/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/22/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/08/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/13/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/13/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/21/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/21/2004
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/23/2004
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/23/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/29/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/29/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/29/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/29/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/29/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/29/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/29/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/29/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/29/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/29/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/29/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/29/2004
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/29/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/29/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/29/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/30/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/30/2004
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/30/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew