There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Keeping Families Together Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to establish a State family support grant program to end the practice of parents giving legal custody of their seriously emotionally disturbed children to State agencies for the purpose of obtaining mental health services for those children.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/02/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/27/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/02/2003Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/02/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/07/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/15/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/17/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/17/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/17/2003
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/17/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/17/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/20/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/28/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/28/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/29/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 11/07/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/08/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 01/27/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/27/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/04/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 02/04/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/04/2004
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/11/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/02/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 03/03/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/18/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/18/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 04/20/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/20/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/28/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/28/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/28/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/22/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/06/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/06/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/06/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/06/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/06/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/06/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/06/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/06/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/06/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/06/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/06/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/06/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/06/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/06/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/06/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/06/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/06/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/06/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/06/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/08/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/16/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce10/02/2003 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/27/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3243. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/02/2003)

Keeping Families Together Act - Amends the Public Health Service Act to direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to award competitive grants to States to establish systems of individualized mental health treatment and family support services for children who are in custody or in danger of entering the custody of the state for the purpose of receiving mental health services.

Requires eligible States to: (1) have laws or policies in effect that ensure that children receive appropriate mental health services so that parents do not have to relinquish legal custody of such children; (2) provide matching funds; (3) establish infrastructure for interagency cooperation and cross system financing; and (4) expand public health insurance programs to cover these services after the grant expires.

Establishes a Federal interagency task force to examine mental health issues in the child welfare and juvenile justice systems and the role of their agencies in promoting access by children and youth to mental health services.

Amends the Social Security Act to permit the use of the Medicaid home and community-based services waiver to provide mental health services to children and youths as an alternative to care in inpatient psychiatric hospitals.