Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/07/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/15/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/17/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/17/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/17/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/17/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/17/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/20/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/28/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/28/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/29/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 11/07/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/08/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 01/27/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/27/2004
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/04/2004
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 02/04/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/04/2004
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/11/2004
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/02/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 03/03/2004
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/03/2004
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/18/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/18/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 04/20/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/20/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/28/2004
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/28/2004
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/28/2004
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/22/2004
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/06/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/06/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/06/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/06/2004
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/06/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/06/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/06/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/06/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/06/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/06/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/06/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/06/2004
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/06/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/06/2004
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/06/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/06/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/06/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/06/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/06/2004
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/08/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/16/2004