Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 10/02/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/15/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/15/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/15/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/15/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/15/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/15/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/15/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/15/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/15/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/15/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/15/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/15/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/15/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/15/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/15/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/16/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/17/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/17/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/17/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/17/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/21/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/21/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/21/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/21/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/21/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/21/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/21/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/21/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/21/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/21/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/21/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/21/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/28/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/28/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/28/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/28/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/28/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/28/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/29/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/29/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/29/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/29/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/30/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/05/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 11/05/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/06/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/06/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/18/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/18/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/18/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/18/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/18/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/18/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 11/18/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/18/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/19/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/20/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 11/21/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/21/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/08/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/08/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/08/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/08/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/08/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/03/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/03/2004
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/13/2004