There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Commercial Space Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote the development of the commercial space transportation industry, to authorize appropriations for the Office of the Associate Administrator for Commercial Space Transportation, to authorize appropriations for the Office of Space Commerce, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
10/02/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
03/04/2004Provisions of H.R.3245 were Incorporated into H.R.3752..
11/05/2003Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Science Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics
10/08/2003Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Science Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics
10/08/2003Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Science Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics
10/06/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.
Action By: Committee on Science
10/02/2003Referred to the House Committee on Science.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/02/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 10/02/2003

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science10/02/2003 Referred to
House Science Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics10/06/2003 Referred to
11/05/2003 Hearings by
10/08/2003 Markup by
10/08/2003 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3245. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/02/2003)

Commercial Space Act of 2003 - Amends the Commercial Space Launch Act (CSLA) to prohibit CSLA license holders from launching or reentering a spaceflight participant unless: (1) the participant has received training and met medical or other standards specified in the license; (2) the participant is informed of the safety record of the launch or reentry vehicle type; and (3) the launch or reentry vehicle is marked to distinguish it from an aircraft in a manner specified by the Secretary of Transportation.

Requires the Secretary to create, and report to Congress on progress in implementing, a streamlined, cost-effective, and enabling regulatory framework for the U.S. commercial human spaceflight industry.

Extends current indemnification provisions for commercial space transportation through calendar 2007.

Requires the Secretary to arrange with the National Academy of Public Administration to study and report to Congress on the liability risk-sharing regime for U.S. commercial space transportation.

Redesignates the Department of Commerce's Office of Space Commercialization as the Office of Space Commerce (OSC).

Requires the Secretary of Commerce to delegate to the Director of OSC the Secretary's licensing authority for private remote sensing space systems (satellite photo systems). Amends the Technology Administration Act of 1998 to reflect this delegation of authority and to give the Director of OSC responsibility for serving as Executive Secretary for the Interagency Global Positioning System Executive Board.