Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 10/02/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 10/02/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 10/02/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 10/02/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/08/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/16/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/16/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 10/16/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/20/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/20/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/29/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/29/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/06/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/06/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/06/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 11/06/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/06/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 01/21/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 02/03/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/11/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 02/11/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/24/2004
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 02/24/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/24/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/04/2004
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/10/2004
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/23/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/23/2004
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/23/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/23/2004
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/30/2004
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/28/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/28/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/28/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/03/2004
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/16/2004