Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 10/02/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 10/07/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/15/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/15/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/15/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/15/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/16/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/20/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/24/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/14/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 11/17/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/27/2004
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/27/2004