Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 10/08/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/30/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/30/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/30/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/21/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/08/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 12/08/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/08/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/28/2004