Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/16/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/16/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/17/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/17/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/17/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 10/17/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/17/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 10/17/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/17/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/17/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/17/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/17/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/17/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 10/17/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/17/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/17/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/17/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/17/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/17/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 10/17/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/17/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/17/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/17/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/17/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/17/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/17/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/17/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/17/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/17/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/17/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/17/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/17/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/17/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/17/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/17/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/17/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/17/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/17/2003
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/17/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/17/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 10/17/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/17/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/17/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 10/17/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/17/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/17/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/17/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/17/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/17/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/17/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/17/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/17/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/17/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 10/17/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 10/17/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 10/17/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/17/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/17/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/17/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/17/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/17/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/17/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/17/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/21/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/21/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/21/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/21/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 10/21/2003
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/21/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/21/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 10/21/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/21/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/21/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/28/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/28/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/28/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/28/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 10/29/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/29/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 10/29/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 10/29/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/29/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 10/29/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/29/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/29/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/29/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/29/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/29/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/29/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/29/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/29/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/29/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 10/29/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/29/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 10/29/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 10/29/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 10/29/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/29/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/29/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/29/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/29/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/04/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 11/04/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 11/04/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/04/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 11/04/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/04/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/04/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 11/04/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/04/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/04/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 11/04/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 11/04/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/04/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 11/04/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/04/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 11/04/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/04/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/04/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/04/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/18/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/20/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/20/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/20/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 11/20/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/20/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/21/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/25/2003