Committees: H.R.3266 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security10/08/2003 Referred to
03/17/2004 Markup by
04/02/2004 Reported by House Report 108-460,Part 1
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness and Response10/14/2003 Referred to
10/16/2003 Hearings by
11/20/2003 Markup by
11/20/2003 Reported by
House Transportation and Infrastructure10/08/2003 Referred to
06/02/2004 Markup by
06/21/2004 Reported by House Report 108-460,Part 3
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management10/09/2003 Referred to
06/01/2004 Markup by
06/01/2004 Reported by
House Judiciary10/08/2003 Referred to
06/16/2004 Markup by
06/21/2004 Reported by House Report 108-460,Part 4
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security10/22/2003 Referred to
11/20/2003 Hearings by
06/05/2004 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce10/08/2003 Referred to
06/03/2004 Markup by
06/14/2004 Reported by House Report 108-460,Part 2
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/27/2003 Referred to
05/11/2004 Hearings by
House Science04/02/2004 Referred to
04/02/2004 Discharged from