Committees: H.R.3277 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services10/08/2003 Referred to
03/17/2004 Markup by
04/27/2004 Reported by H. Rept. 108-474,Part 1
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy, Trade, and Technology10/22/2003 Referred to
03/10/2004 Hearings by
03/10/2004 Markup by
03/10/2004 Reported by
House Ways and Means04/27/2004 Referred to
06/23/2004 Markup by
07/06/2004 Reported by H. Rept. 108-474,Part 2