Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/05/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/05/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/05/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/05/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/05/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/05/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 02/05/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/05/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 02/05/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/05/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/05/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/05/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/05/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 02/05/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/05/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/05/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/05/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/05/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/05/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/05/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/05/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/05/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/05/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/05/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/05/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/05/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/05/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/05/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/05/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/05/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/06/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/06/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/20/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/20/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/20/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/20/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/20/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/20/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/20/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/27/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/27/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/03/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/03/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/03/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/11/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/11/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/11/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/11/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/29/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 04/29/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/29/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/29/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 04/29/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/07/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/07/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/07/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/07/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/07/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/07/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/07/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/14/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/14/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 05/14/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/14/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/14/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/14/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/14/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/14/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/15/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/15/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/15/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/15/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/15/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/22/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/22/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/22/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/22/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/22/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/22/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/05/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/05/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/05/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/05/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/05/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/05/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/05/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/23/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/23/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/23/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/23/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/23/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/21/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/21/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/23/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/20/2004