Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 10/08/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 10/08/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/16/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/21/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 10/21/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/29/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 10/29/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/05/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/05/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/05/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/06/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 01/21/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/03/2004
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/01/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/20/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/20/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/20/2004
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/20/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/20/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/04/2004
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/04/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/04/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/04/2004
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/04/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/01/2004
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/15/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/15/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/15/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/15/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/15/2004
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/17/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/17/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/17/2004
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/20/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/06/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/06/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/07/2004