Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 10/15/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 11/05/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/05/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/05/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/06/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 11/06/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/06/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/07/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/07/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/07/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/17/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/17/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/17/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 11/17/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/18/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/18/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/20/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/20/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/20/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/03/2004
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/09/2004