There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop Terrorism of Property Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to create the Federal crime of eco-terrorism.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/16/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/22/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/16/2003Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/16/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (54)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 10/16/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 10/16/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 10/16/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/18/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 11/19/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/27/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/25/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/25/2004
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/04/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/01/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/18/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/02/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/17/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/22/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary10/16/2003 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security10/22/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3307.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3307. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/16/2003)

Stop Terrorism of Property Act of 2003 - Amends the Federal criminal code to prohibit intentionally, in or affecting interstate or foreign commerce, damaging the property of another with the intent to influence the public with regard to conduct the offender considers harmful to the environment (eco-terrorism).