Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 10/16/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 10/16/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 10/16/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/18/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 11/19/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/27/2004
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/25/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/25/2004
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/04/2004
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/01/2004
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/18/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/02/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/17/2004
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/22/2004