Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/20/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/20/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/20/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/19/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 11/19/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/19/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/19/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/19/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 11/19/2003
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 11/19/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 12/08/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/23/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/23/2004
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/23/2004
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/01/2004
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/01/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/01/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/21/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/21/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/08/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/08/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/09/2004

Show cosponsors who withdrew