Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 10/20/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/20/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/20/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/20/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/21/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/21/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/30/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/17/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/18/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/21/2004
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 01/28/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/11/2004
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/30/2004
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/30/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/11/2004
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/11/2004
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/11/2004
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/11/2004
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/11/2004
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/11/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/19/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 05/19/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/19/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/15/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/15/2004
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/23/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/23/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/24/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/24/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/09/2004
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/09/2004
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/13/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/13/2004
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/13/2004
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/14/2004
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/14/2004