Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 10/16/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 10/28/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/29/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/05/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 11/14/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/13/2004