Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/16/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/21/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/21/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/21/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/21/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/17/2004
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/17/2004
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/17/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/01/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/24/2004