Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/08/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 01/08/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/05/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/05/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/05/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/05/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/05/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/05/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/25/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/19/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/09/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/09/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/10/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/16/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/04/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/04/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/23/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/15/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/20/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/20/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/29/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/29/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/29/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/30/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/30/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/04/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/05/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/17/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/08/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/22/2004
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/19/2004