There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Hospitalized Veterans Financial Assistance Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to allow the payment of veterans' benefits in all hospitalization and convalescent claims to begin effective on the day on which hospitalization or treatment begins.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/20/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
11/13/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/20/2003Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/20/2003Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2097-2098)
Action By: House of Representatives
10/20/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/20/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 10/20/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 10/20/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 10/20/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 10/20/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/20/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/20/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/21/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/28/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/28/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/29/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/29/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/29/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 10/30/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/30/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/30/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/30/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/30/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/04/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/04/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/04/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/05/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/05/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/05/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/05/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/05/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/05/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/07/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 11/07/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/17/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/17/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/17/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 11/18/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/18/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/18/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/18/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/18/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/19/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/19/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/19/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/19/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 11/19/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/20/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/20/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 11/20/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/21/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/21/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/25/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/25/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/24/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/24/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/25/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/25/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/02/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/18/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/20/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs10/20/2003 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits11/13/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3344.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3344. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/20/2003)

Hospitalized Veterans Financial Assistance Act of 2003 - Makes the commencement date of the period of payment of a temporary increase in veterans' disability compensation for hospitalization or treatment the day on which such hospitalization or treatment commences. (Currently, such date is the first day of the month in which such hospitalization or treatment commences, when the hospitalization or treatment commences and terminates within the same calendar month.)