Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/20/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 10/20/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 10/20/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 10/20/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 10/20/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/20/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/20/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/21/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/28/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/28/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/29/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/29/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/29/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 10/30/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/30/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/30/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/30/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/30/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/04/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/04/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/04/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/05/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/05/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 11/05/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/05/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/05/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/05/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/07/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/07/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 11/07/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/17/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/17/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/17/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 11/18/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/18/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/18/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/18/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/18/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/19/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/19/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/19/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/19/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 11/19/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/20/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/20/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/20/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 11/20/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/21/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/21/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/25/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/25/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 12/08/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/11/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/24/2004
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/24/2004
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/24/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/24/2004
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/25/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/25/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/02/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/02/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/18/2004
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/20/2004