Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/24/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/24/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/24/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/24/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/28/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/29/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/30/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/04/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/04/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/04/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/04/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/05/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/05/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/05/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/17/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/17/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/17/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/17/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/17/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/17/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/17/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/19/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 11/21/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 12/08/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/20/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/20/2004
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/21/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/03/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/03/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/03/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/10/2004
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/10/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/09/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/09/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/09/2004
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/09/2004
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/09/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/09/2004
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/17/2004
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/24/2004
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/24/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/24/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/24/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/21/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/05/2004
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/10/2004
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/11/2004
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/20/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/22/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/06/2004
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/21/2004
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/13/2004
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/04/2004
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/05/2004
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/06/2004
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/08/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/16/2004