Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 10/21/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 10/21/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/28/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/28/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/30/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/30/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/04/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/04/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/19/2003